FL H1059 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to vessel registration fees & hunting & fishing license fees; revises provisions for calculating periodic increases in such fees.
Title
Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56) |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5503 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-56, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1059 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1059/BillText/Filed/PDF |