FL H1059 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires party to civil action to provide other parties with certain agreements under which persons have right to receive compensation contingent upon proceeds of action.
Title
Civil Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S794 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1059 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1059/BillText/Filed/PDF |