FL H1069 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to allocation of funding for community-based care lead agencies; requires that certain factors be considered in allocating core services funds to community-based care lead agencies; provides for calculation of such allocation of core services funds; requires DCF to adopt rules.
Title
Community-based Care Lead Agency Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-12-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1446 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1069 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1069/BillText/Filed/PDF |