FL H1073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2016-242)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2016-242)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires landlord, condominium association, cooperative association, or homeowners' association to complete processing of rental application submitted by servicemember within specified timeframe; provides applicability.
Title
Military Support
Sponsors
House Local and Federal Affairs Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2016-242) |
2016-02-19 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-02-04 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | CS referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2016-02-03 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-01 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1656 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
S0184 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-242
S0184 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-242
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 683 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |