FL H1095 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that student's parent has right to request that student be exempted from instruction in English language proficiency; requires school district to exempt student from participating in instruction in English language proficiency if student's parent requests exemption in writing.
Title
English Language Instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0868 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1095 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1095/BillText/Filed/PDF |