FL H1095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing term limits for the Public Counsel; revising and providing noncriminal violations relating to the transportation of certain hazardous materials; authorizing the State Fire Marshal or his or her agents to issue certain citations; requiring certain persons to transmit an incident report to the State Fire Marshal; requiring Sunshine State One-Call of Florida, Inc., to review certain reports and complaints, etc.
Title
Infrastructure Regulation
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Energy and Utilities Subcommittee | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] | Rep. Jackie Toledo [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#745 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#591 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#591 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-137 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (881186) |
2020-03-10 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (881186) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1464 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (863647) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-21 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1095
S7052 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S7052 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
350 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |