FL H1109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides limitation on salaries of employees of certain nongovernmental organizations, quasi-governmental entities, & not-for-profit organizations; requires approval by Legislative Budget Commission for salaries that exceed limitation; provides requirements relating to use of appropriated funds for administrative costs, including salaries; provides that certain organizations & entities are ineligible for state-appropriated funds, including state-appropriated federal funds, under certain conditions.
Title
Compensation of Employees of Nongovernmental Organizations, Quasi-Governmental Entities, and Not-for-Profit Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1672 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1109 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1109/BillText/Filed/PDF |