FL H1109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises timeframe for overpayment claims by health insurers & health maintenance organizations against providers; provides applicability of such timeframe to overpayment claims as result of specified retroactive review or audit.
Title
Timeframes for Overpayment Claims By Health Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1386 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1109 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1109/BillText/Filed/PDF |