FL H1117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates study group to evaluate percentage of funds that counties are required to contribute to Medicaid program & provide recommendations to Governor & Legislature.
Title
County Contributions to Medicaid Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1244 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1117 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1117/BillText/Filed/PDF |