FL H1137 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires collection & sharing of data between multiple agencies for interagency cooperative agreement; provides requirements for accountability measures; requires Office of Reimagining Education & Career Help to issue annual statewide report each year.
Title
Employment of Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Redondo [R] | Rep. Kimberly Berfield [R] | Rep. Adam Botana [R] | Rep. Vicki Lopez [R] |
Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S832 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-60