FL H1171 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reclassification of certain offenses when committed against persons 65 years of age or older, against minors, or against persons with disabilities; provides for civil actions for damages by persons whose image or likeness was used in scheme to defraud with their consent.
Title
Schemes to Defraud
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Kevin Steele [R] | Rep. Webster Barnaby [R] |
Rep. Fabian Basabe [R] | Rep. Adam Botana [R] | Rep. Jennifer Canady [R] | Rep. Alina Garcia [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Chapter No. 2024-129 | |
2024-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1220 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 104, NAYS 8 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1220 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1171