FL H1177 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises powers of counties to include hearing appeals from municipal historic preservation boards; prohibits local governments from requiring specified documents or fee for tree pruning, trimming, or removal; prohibits local governments from requiring property owners to replant trees; modifies requirements for local governments implementing transportation concurrency system; revises procedures regarding local government review of changes to previously approved developments of regional impact; authorizes changes to multimodal pathways in previously approved developments of regional impact.
Title
Land Development
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Ways & Means Committee | House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | Rep. Wyman Duggan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-02-19 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-02-07 | House | Removed from Meeting Agenda of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1110 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
H1221 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1419 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H1221 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1419 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 31801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |