FL H1189 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Community Mental Health & Substance Abuse Treatment & Crime Reduction Act; requires DCFS, in consultation with AHCA, to develop & implement community mental health & substance abuse forensic treatment system; provides initiatives & strategies for community forensic system; details services; requires DCFS to develop continuum of services; requires county councils to consult with local governing bodies when planning or implementing act, etc.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Kevin Ambler [R] | Rep. Ronald Brise [D] | Rep. William Snyder [R] |
Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00379 | |
2010-03-18 | CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00337; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00340; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-16 | CS by Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00302 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), 03/16/10, 10:15 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00204 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00106 | |
2010-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1140 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1005 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-64; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2010-113)
H1327 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC)
H1005 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-64; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2010-113)
H1327 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0394 | 4656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0916 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |