FL H1201 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Truth in Government Act"; requires persons who address legislative committees to take oath or affirmation of truthfulness; provides exceptions; provides penalties; requires member of committee to administer oath or affirmation; authorizes use of signed appearance form in lieu of oral oath or affirmation; provides penalties for making false statement after signing form.
Title
Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00204 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00107 | |
2010-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2252 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 1435 | New Code | See Bill Text |