FL H1201 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1276 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1276 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Friends of Florida Citrus Program within Department of Citrus; authorizes program to receive certain funds; requires such funds to be deposited into Florida Citrus Advertising Trust Fund; creates Friends of Florida Citrus Advisory Council; authorizes department to loan or share employees & enter into agreements with specified entities, subject to prior approval; removes provisions setting out required work schedule for department.
Title
Department of Citrus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1276 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-03-02 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/02/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1276 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-151
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
601 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |