FL H1201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership of board of directors of Space Florida to include two ex officio, nonvoting members appointed by Legislature.
Title
Space Florida Board of Directors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1512 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages