FL H1203 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Chapter No. 2024-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Chapter No. 2024-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing requirements for certain community association managers and community association management firms; requiring certain associations to post certain documents on its website or make available such documents through an application by a date certain; providing that an association or its agent is not liable for the disclosure of certain information; requiring an association or any architectural, construction improvement, or other such similar committee of an association to apply and enforce certain standards reasonably and equitably; etc.
Title
Homeowners' Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#970 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#644 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#644 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Chapter No. 2024-221 | |
2024-05-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment 254472 Concur |
2024-03-07 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (254472) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 7044 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-22 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 2 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-18 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-17 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-12 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7046 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
H1243 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
S7044 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1203
H1243 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
S7044 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1203
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 4334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |