FL H1213 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands exemptions from sales & use tax on labor & parts & equipment used in aircraft repairs on certain aircraft weighing more than 2,000 pounds.
Title
Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 213 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 118 | |
2012-01-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1213 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1213/BillText/Filed/PDF |