FL H1217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1726 (Ch. 2017-124)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1726 (Ch. 2017-124)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified state universities to engage in industrial hemp programs under certain conditions; requires universities to adopt rules, pursue funding, & submit report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Industrial Hemp Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1726 (Ch. 2017-124) |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1726 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-04-21 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-18 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 4 |
2017-04-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/18/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1726 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-124
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 4473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 0855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |