FL H1243 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires records relating to clemency investigation of individual subject to judgment imposing death penalty be released to such individual, or his or her legal counsel, upon written request.
Title
Executive Clemency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1410 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1243 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1243/BillText/Filed/PDF |