FL H1249 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires supervisor of elections or political subdivision that administers election to provide language-related assistance to limited English-proficient voter; requires supervisor or political subdivision to provide election materials in covered language; requires supervisor to operate & provide public notice of language assistance hotline; requires governmental entity responsible for redistricting to provide translation services; authorizes limited English-proficient voter to bring actions against supervisor or political subdivision.
Title
Limited English-proficient Voter Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Johanna Lopez [D] | Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] | Rep. Lisa Dunkley [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Harris [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Katherine Waldron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1560 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1249 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1249/BillText/Filed/PDF |