FL H1267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to stop increases in federal loan guarantee program for new nuclear reactors & rescind remaining funds, eliminate funding for mixed oxide plutonium fuel plants, support energy efficiency & renewable sources of energy, fund nuclear waste immobilization, increase funding for environmental cleanup programs, enact moratorium by U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission on nuclear waste operations, direct U.S. Department of Energy to comply with all cleanup agreements & legacy management requirements, & authorize nationwide study.
Title
Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1267 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1267/BillText/Filed/PDF |