FL H1267 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to provide calculation for measuring mesh area of shrimp trawls under marine net fishing limitation.
Title
Calculation for Measuring Shrimp Trawls
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1267 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1267/BillText/Filed/PDF |