FL H1299 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions declaring that specified information concerning certain juvenile offenders not be considered confidential & exempt from s. 119.07(1), F.S.; provides for future legislative review & repeal of amendments & reversion of text under Open Government Sunset Review Act; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Juvenile History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 118 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1299 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1299/BillText/Filed/HTML |