FL H1299 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for outdoor signs along state roads.
Title
Transportation
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Tom Goodson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained on Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/13, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2013-03-26 | House | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-25 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1632 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |