FL H1299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises penalties for noncompliance with work requirements for temporary cash assistance; limits receipt of child-only benefits during periods of noncompliance with work requirements; provides applicability of work requirements before expiration of minimum penalty period; requires DCF to refer sanctioned participants to appropriate community services; requires DEO, in cooperation with CareerSource Florida, Inc., & DCF, to develop & implement work plan agreement for participants in temporary cash assistance program; requires DCF to impose replacement fee for EBT cards; revises eligibility guidelines for Relative Caregiver Program with respect to relative & nonrelative caregivers; provides appropriation.
Title
Public Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-16 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 2 |
2016-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/16/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-26 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2016-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, 12 HOB --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0563 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 5085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |