FL H1305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Chapter No. 2024-199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Chapter No. 2024-199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "Florida financial institution."
Title
Residential Tenancies
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Randy Maggard [R] | Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] | Rep. Alina Garcia [R] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Lauren Melo [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#622 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#622 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Chapter No. 2024-199 | |
2024-05-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1466 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1305
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
553 | 895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |