FL H1319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensed dentist to order physical impression materials for self-administration by a patient for a specified purpose.
Title
Dental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy