FL H1329 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for licensed manufacturer of malt beverages to sell such beverages directly to consumers; provides requirements for taproom; prohibits manufacturer from holding vendor's license at specified premises; provides requirements for licensed manufacturer to obtain vendor's license; requires manufacturer to complete certain reports; provides requirements for brewpub to be licensed as manufacturer or vendor; provides requirements for brewpub to sell alcoholic beverages to consumers; prohibits common carriers from making deliveries of malt beverages to consumers; provides that possessing & transporting growler is lawful; provides requirements for growlers.
Title
Malt Beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-04-01 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-27 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0283 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
S0470 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
S1714 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
S0470 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
S1714 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 5101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |