FL H1335 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Fair Economy Act"; requires members of unitary business or water's edge group to file combined corporate income tax return & allocate income to Florida using single apportionment computation; disregards intercompany transactions between affiliated entities; adopts throw-out rule for sales & income attributable to Florida by members whose activities are excluded from apportionment; requires water's edge group to file domestic disclosure spreadsheet disclosing income reported to each state, state tax liability, & method used to apportion or allocate income to each state; provides transition rules; requires DEO, with DOR, to submit annual report of economic development incentives & state expenditures for economic development activities; provides for withholding of certain funds from property-taxing authorities that do not submit reports; requires granting authorities to use unified application for award of incentives, submit approved applications to DEO, & submit progress reports to DEO on incentives; requires recipient corporations & their corporate parents to provide access to project sites & certain records; authorizes fines against recipient corporations that do not grant access or submit reports; provides for recapture & repayment of incentives from recipient corporations that do not meet certain job, wage, & employee benefit requirements or whose corporate parents do not maintain certain levels of employment in state.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 131 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1845 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 30781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1335 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1335/BillText/Filed/PDF |