FL H1341 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for licensure as massage therapist; provides applicability for persons who were issued license as massage apprentice before specified date.
Title
Massage Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-26 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S390 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H707 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H707 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
477 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |