FL H1357 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHSMV to implement protocols for issuing optional electronic credential & procure related technology solution; requires that certain revenue be deposited into Motor Vehicle License Clearing Trust Fund for distribution; authorizes DHSMV to assess competitive market rate fee structure; requires that electronic credential be in format that allows certain entities to verify authenticity of such electronic credential & to validate certain privileges; provides for assumption of liability.
Title
Information Technology
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Appropriations Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] |
Rep. Jackie Toledo [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | CS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-14 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S448 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
282 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
668 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |