FL H1363 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for FWCC & certain law enforcement agencies or officers to relocate or remove vessels that constitute navigation hazard or interfere with another vessel.
Title
Vessel Safety
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#729 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#729 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-143 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1594 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-25 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-20 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1594 (Same As) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1363 (Ch. 2014-143)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |