FL H1375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain property damaged or destroyed Hurricane Irma to receive abatement of certain property taxes; specifies procedures to use in applying for abatement of taxes; provides property appraiser & tax collector duties relative to investigating statements & determining amount of disaster relief credit; requires tax collector to reduce taxes in specified manner; provides retroactive applicability & expiration date.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1600 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1375 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1375/BillText/Filed/PDF |