FL H1375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Florida Seal of Fine Arts Program within DOE; provides purpose of program; specifies eligibility requirements for awarding of Seal of Fine Arts; defines "work of art"; authorizes State Board of Education to adopt additional requirements for award of seal; requires Commissioner of Education & school districts to perform specified duties to administer program; prohibits school district or DOE from charging fee for seal; requires state board to adopt rules.
Title
Florida Seal of Fine Arts Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1740 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1375 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1375/BillText/Filed/PDF |