FL H1397 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts purchase of handguns by qualified law enforcement officers or qualified retired law enforcement officers from 3-day waiting period.
Title
Exception to Waiting Period for Purchasing and Delivering Handguns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1395 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S1132 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1134 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1132 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1134 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice