FL H1417 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provision requiring certain net metering be made available when utility purchases power generated from biogas produced by anaerobic digestions of agricultural waste; ratifies rules on renewable portfolio standards adopted by Public Service Commission.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00126 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0774 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S2660 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S2660 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities