FL H1427 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Public Service Commission (PSC) to consider certain factors in performing its duties; requires PSC to ensure that utility rate structures are designed to meet certain goals; provides requirements for such rate structure determinations; revises provisions authorizing commission to establish financial rewards & penalties relating to such goals; requires impact studies for proposed power plants; requires commission to initiate specified rulemaking; requires electric utilities to collect monthly systems charge from residential, commercial, & industrial customers; provides for deposit of collected funds into Sustainable & Renewable Energy Policy Trust Fund; creates direct-support organization for Office of Energy; requires contract between office & direct-support organization; provides for use of funds; requires annual audit; requires that purchase contract offered to producers of renewable energy contain payment provisions for energy & capacity based upon public utility's equivalent cost-recovery rate for certain clean energy projects; extends period of time for which residents are eligible to receive rebates for specified solar energy systems; provides schedule for rebate amounts.
Title
Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 216 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 143 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
350 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1427 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1427/BillText/Filed/PDF |