FL H1447 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Commission on Mental Health & Substance Abuse; requires DCF to provide administrative & staff support services; provides purposes; provides for membership, term limits, meetings, & duties of commission; requires commission to submit reports of its findings & recommendations to Legislature & Governor; provides for future repeal unless saved by Legislature through reenactment.
Title
Commission on Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#204 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-04-09 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-26 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1888 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
S1844 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
S1852 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S96 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-170
S1844 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
S1852 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S96 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-170