FL H1461 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Drive for Success Pilot Program within Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation to assist certain persons in reinstating suspended driver licenses; requires administration of program by clerks of court in certain counties; authorizes collaboration with Florida Association of Court Clerks & Comptrollers for certain purposes; provides duties of clerks of court; prohibits eligibility under certain circumstances; requires clerks of court to submit reports to Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation; requires Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation to submit report to Governor & Legislature; provides for expiration of pilot program.
Title
Reinstatement of Suspended Driver Licenses
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Felicia Simone Robinson [D] |
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-02-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1638 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation