FL H1469 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Commercial Rent Stabilization Fund as separate account within Economic Development Trust Fund; provides conditions for relief from fund; provides for payment, subject to availability, from fund; provides liability; prohibits landlord from filing action for possession for certain period of time; provides appropriation; requires certain funds remaining in Florida Commercial Rent Stabilization Fund to be transferred to General Revenue Fund.
Title
Florida Commercial Rent Stabilization Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2002 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1469 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1469/BillText/Filed/PDF |