FL H1473 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2021-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2021-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & creates provisions relating to children & young adults in out-of-home care, including case record face sheets; postdisposition changes of custody; placement of children in out-of-home care; child & family teams; placing siblings in same out-of-home placement; Office of Continuing Care responsibilities; judicial review hearings; reinstatement of parental rights; community-based care lead agencies & the Independent Living Services Advisory Council responsibilities; requirements of the Florida Institute for Child Welfare.
Title
Children and Young Adults in Out-of-home Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2021-169) |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-10 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-09 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-04 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S80 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-169
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 00146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 14515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |