FL H1477 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires functioning automated external defibrillators be located on premises of specified parks & facilities; provides requirements for training & location registration of such defibrillators.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators at Parks and Youth Recreation or Sports Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1774 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1477 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1477/BillText/Filed/PDF |