FL H1481 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local governmental entities to adopt & apply certain regulations & ordinances to vacation rentals under certain circumstances; provides exceptions; requires applicant for vacation rental license to provide Division of Hotels & Restaurants of DBPR with certain information.
Title
Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H219 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
S522 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
S1988 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
S522 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
S1988 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1481 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1481/BillText/Filed/PDF |