FL H1519 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DMS to prepare inventory of state-owned motor vehicles, maintenance facilities, & fuel depots; requires state agencies & state universities to provide information requested by DMS; creates Fleet Operations Management Pilot Program; provides requirements for contracts & pilot program; specifies requirements for motor vehicle-monitoring hardware installed in state-owned motor vehicle; authorizes termination or acceleration of pilot program.
Title
Fleet Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-11 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | PCS added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S906 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government