FL H1529 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain health insurers to apply payments for services provided by nonpreferred providers toward insureds' deductibles & out-of-pocket maximums if specified conditions are met.
Title
Applicability of Payments for Nonpreferred Provider Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-17 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |