FL H5005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse between State of Florida & certified bargaining units for state employees pursuant to specified instructions.
Title
Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125) |
2017-04-13 | House | Substituted SB 2504 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2504 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-125, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Line Item(s) Overridden 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Line Item(s) Overridden 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/5005 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/5005/BillText/Filed/PDF |