FL H5105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for carryforward of unexpended balance of appropriation for Ed and Ethel Moore Alzheimer's Disease Research Program.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease Research
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-25 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/25/15, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5105 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5105/BillText/Filed/PDF |