FL H6021 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abrogates future repeal of provisions related to guardian ad litem direct-support organization.
Title
Guardian Ad Litem Direct-Support Organization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#524 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#524 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Chapter No. 2018-38 | |
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-02-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Substituted for SB 222 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Received |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18 |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/11/18, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H275 (Same As) 2017-10-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S222 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6021
S222 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6021