FL H7005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 72 (Ch. 2021-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 72 (Ch. 2021-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for civil action based on COVID-19-related medical claim; provides requirements for civil action based on COVID-19-related negligence claim; specifies timeframe within which civil action may be commenced; provides retroactive application; provides for applicability; provides exception of application of this act to certain civil actions.
Title
Civil Liability for Covid-19-related Claims Against Certain Health Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 72 (Ch. 2021-1) |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-12 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-04 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda |
2021-02-24 | House | Now in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S74 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 72 (Ch. 2021-1)
S72 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Chapter No. 2021-1
S72 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Chapter No. 2021-1